This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/21/2020 at 14:11:01 (UTC).

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK v. LUISA M MENA

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against LUISA M MENA. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DEPARTMENT STORES NATIONAL BANK

Defendant

Luisa M Mena

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SLAMOWITZ, MITCHELL G

Attorney at Selip & Stylianou, LLP

Defendant Attorney

MCINTYRE, JOHN FRANCIS

Attorney at National Litigation Law Group, PLLC

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Mcintyre, J.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING

202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 08/22/2019; Received: 08/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 07/22/2019; Received: 07/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Mcintyre, J.; Filed: 03/13/2019; Received: 03/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket202.27-B PROOF OF MAILING; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Slamowitz, M. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Slamowitz, M.; Filed: 01/22/2019; Received: 01/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less