This case was last updated from Richmond County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 03:35:06 (UTC).

Dennis W. Quirk v. Kevin Kading

Case Summary

On 04/10/2019 Dennis W Quirk filed an Other lawsuit against Kevin Kading. This case was filed in Richmond County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    04/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Richmond County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dennis W. Quirk

Defendant

Kevin Kading

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MARANGOS, JOHN ZACHARY

Attorney at JOHN Z MARANGOS ESQ

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 15, 2019

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 15, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) STATEMENT FOR JUDGMENT ETC.

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) STATEMENT FOR JUDGMENT ETC.; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit in Compliance with the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act

EXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit in Compliance with the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS ETC.

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS ETC.; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR STATEMENT FOR JUDGMENT

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR STATEMENT FOR JUDGMENT; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON KEVIN KADING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON KEVIN KADING; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KEVIN KADING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KEVIN KADING; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A PROMISSORY NOTE

EXHIBIT(S) - A PROMISSORY NOTE; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on July 15, 2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) STATEMENT FOR JUDGMENT ETC.; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/15/2019; Received: 07/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Affidavit in Compliance with the Servicemembers Civil Relief Act; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS ETC.; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE FOR STATEMENT FOR JUDGMENT; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) STATEMENT FOR JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON KEVIN KADING; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 05/31/2019; Received: 05/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE KEVIN KADING; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A PROMISSORY NOTE; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SUMMONS AND VERIFIED COMPLAINT; Filed By: Marangos, J.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less