This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 12:10:39 (UTC).

DELRHON WILLIAMS v. JUAN J. ECHEVARRIA et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 DELRHON WILLIAMS filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JUAN J ECHEVARRIA. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is John R Higgitt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

John R Higgitt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Delrhon Williams

Defendants

JUAN J. ECHEVARRIA

Dulce M. Deleon

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRAVERMAN, MICHAEL IRA

Attorney at GETZ & BRAVERMAN

Defendant Attorney

CRUZADO, SAMANTHA LEE

Attorney at Keane & Bernheimer, PLLC.

 

Court Documents

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED: 11/15/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED: 11/15/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

ORDER - INTERIM DATED 11/1/2019

ORDER - INTERIM DATED 11/1/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

PROOF OF SERVICE Notice to Appoint

PROOF OF SERVICE Notice to Appoint; Filed By: Cruzado, S.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Cruzado, S.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

ORDER - INTERIM DATED: 10/18/2019

ORDER - INTERIM DATED: 10/18/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED SEPT 13,2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED SEPT 13,2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 07/30/2019

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 07/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001)

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Cruzado, S.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Cruzado, S.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) DEFAULT LETTER

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) DEFAULT LETTER; Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE; Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED: 11/15/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/26/2019; Received: 11/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - INTERIM DATED 11/1/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE Notice to Appoint; Filed By: Cruzado, S.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Cruzado, S.; Filed: 11/08/2019; Received: 11/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - INTERIM DATED: 10/18/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED SEPT 13,2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 08/19/2019; Received: 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #001) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 07/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Cruzado, S.; Filed: 07/02/2019; Received: 07/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Cruzado, S.; Filed: 06/26/2019; Received: 06/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) DEFAULT LETTER; Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT; Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 06/21/2019; Received: 06/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT AFFIDAVITS OF SERVICE; Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 04/10/2019; Received: 04/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Braverman, M.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less