This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 02:10:28 (UTC).

Daysi Cuevas - v. - E. Reyes Housing Development Fund Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Daysi Cuevas filed an Other lawsuit against E Reyes Housing Development Fund Corporation. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daysi Cuevas

Defendants

Los Sures Management Company, Inc.

E. Reyes Housing Development Fund Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TARZY, ALAN ABE

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF ALAN A. TARZY

Defendant Attorney

OWENS, DAVID B.

Attorney at Molod, Spitz & DeSantis, P.C.

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Pleadings; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B- Preliminary Conference Order

EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B- Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Affirmation of Good Faith

AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue; Filed By: Tarzy, A.; Filed: 12/03/2018; Received: 12/03/2018

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION AND OTHER DISCOVERY DEMANDS

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION AND OTHER DISCOVERY DEMANDS; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tarzy, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D- Notice for Discovery and Inspection

EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D- Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Tarzy, A.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service E. Reyes Housing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service E. Reyes Housing; Filed By: Tarzy, A.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

ORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 11/29/18

ORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 11/29/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2018; Received: 12/03/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Los Sures Management

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Los Sures Management; Filed By: Tarzy, A.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C- Compliance Conference Order

EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C- Compliance Conference Order; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) Stipulation of Discontinuance; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 04/08/2019; Received: 04/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Note of Issue; Filed By: Tarzy, A.; Filed: 12/03/2018; Received: 12/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Final Pre-Note - dated 11/29/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2018; Received: 12/03/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D- Notice for Discovery and Inspection; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C- Compliance Conference Order; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B- Preliminary Conference Order; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A- Pleadings; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 10/24/2018; Received: 10/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 10/26/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 11/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Tarzy, A.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION AND OTHER DISCOVERY DEMANDS; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Owens, D.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service Los Sures Management; Filed By: Tarzy, A.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service E. Reyes Housing; Filed By: Tarzy, A.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Tarzy, A.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less