This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/18/2020 at 19:09:19 (UTC).

DAWN HUFFMAN - v. - MEMORIAL SLOAN KETTERING CANCER CENTER COMMACK et al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2017 DAWN HUFFMAN filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against MEMORIAL SLOAN KETTERING CANCER CENTER COMMACK. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Dawn Huffman

Defendants

MEMORIAL SLOAN KETTERING CANCER CENTER COMMACK

Roseann Caruso NP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROSE, MICHAEL A

Attorney at HACH & ROSE, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

NASH, CHRISTINE M.

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP

BAYDALA, BETSY DIANE

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of EBT for Roseann Caruso NP with AOS

NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of EBT for Roseann Caruso NP with AOS; Filed By: Baydala, B.; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rose, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer for Roseann Caruso NP with AOS

ANSWER Verified Answer for Roseann Caruso NP with AOS; Filed By: Baydala, B.; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Defendants' Answers

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Defendants' Answers; Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time To Answer

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time To Answer; Filed By: Baydala, B.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Notice of Medical Malpractice Action

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Notice of Medical Malpractice Action; Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Baydala, B.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rose, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rose, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER FILED UNDER THE WRONG INDEX NUMBER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER FILED UNDER THE WRONG INDEX NUMBER; Filed By: Baydala, B.; Filed: 11/08/2017; Received: 11/08/2017

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/29/2019; Received: 08/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Notice of Medical Malpractice Action; Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Defendants' Answers; Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer for MHCAD with AOS; Filed By: Baydala, B.; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION Notice of EBT for Roseann Caruso NP with AOS; Filed By: Baydala, B.; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer for Roseann Caruso NP with AOS; Filed By: Baydala, B.; Filed: 11/09/2017; Received: 11/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER FILED UNDER THE WRONG INDEX NUMBER; Filed By: Baydala, B.; Filed: 11/08/2017; Received: 11/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Baydala, B.; Filed: 10/30/2017; Received: 10/30/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER Stipulation Extending Time To Answer; Filed By: Baydala, B.; Filed: 10/10/2017; Received: 10/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Rose, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rose, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Rose, M. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 08/24/2017; Received: 08/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rose, M.; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less