This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 14:52:16 (UTC).

Davis Alarms Inc. v. Arha Diamond Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 03/28/2019 Davis Alarms Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Arha Diamond Inc. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Antonio I Brandveen. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Antonio I Brandveen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Davis Alarms Inc. d/b/a D&W Central Station Alarm Co.

Defendants

Arha Diamond Inc.

Nishant Shrimal

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BEIL, MAUREEN T.

Attorney at Kirschenbaum & Kirschenbaum, P.C.

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Arbitration Rule Page

EXHIBIT(S) - D Arbitration Rule Page; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Arbitration Award

EXHIBIT(S) - C Arbitration Award; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Arbitration Filing Notice

EXHIBIT(S) - B Arbitration Filing Notice; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Demand for Arbitration

EXHIBIT(S) - A Demand for Arbitration; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001); Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

PETITION

PETITION; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/20/2019; Received: 06/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 05/03/2019; Received: 05/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Arbitration Rule Page; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Arbitration Award; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Arbitration Filing Notice; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Demand for Arbitration; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PETITION (Motion #001); Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION; Filed By: Beil, M.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less