This case was last updated from Richmond County New York Courts on 03/25/2020 at 14:18:40 (UTC).

David Soto et al - v. - Marek Szczesny et al

Case Summary

On 08/09/2017 David Soto filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Marek Szczesny. This case was filed in Richmond County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/09/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Richmond, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Patricia Huertero

David Soto

Defendants

Magdalena Szczesny

Marek Szczesny

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TORRENZANO, JAY JOHN

Defendant Attorney

MUMFORD, ROGER E.

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

EXTRACT

EXTRACT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) Court Exhibit #2 - Inconsistent Verdict

EXHIBIT(S) Court Exhibit #2 - Inconsistent Verdict; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

EXHIBIT(S) Court Exhibit #1 - Jury Note

EXHIBIT(S) Court Exhibit #1 - Jury Note; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Summary Jury Trial Stipulation and Order

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED Summary Jury Trial Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE

ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING Adjournment of Jury Selection

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING Adjournment of Jury Selection; Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/04/2018; Received: 01/04/2018

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Torrenzano, J.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference, Affirmation of Good Faith, Affidavit of Service

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference, Affirmation of Good Faith, Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Torrenzano, J.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service on M. Szczensky

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service on M. Szczensky; Filed By: Torrenzano, J.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service of M. Szczensky

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service of M. Szczensky; Filed By: Torrenzano, J.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Torrenzano, J.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXTRACT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketVERDICT SHEET Marked as Court Exhibit #3; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) Court Exhibit #2 - Inconsistent Verdict; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) Court Exhibit #1 - Jury Note; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/15/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED Summary Jury Trial Stipulation and Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/29/2019; Received: 04/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING Adjournment of Jury Selection; Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by LAW OFFICE OF NICOLE LESPERANCE; Filed: 02/27/2019; Received: 02/27/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 05/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/16/2018; Received: 05/16/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/16/2018; Received: 02/16/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/04/2018; Received: 01/04/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Torrenzano, J.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference, Affirmation of Good Faith, Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Torrenzano, J.; Filed: 01/02/2018; Received: 01/02/2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Mumford, R. - filed by Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling; Filed: 10/20/2017; Received: 10/20/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service on M. Szczensky; Filed By: Torrenzano, J.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of service of M. Szczensky; Filed By: Torrenzano, J.; Filed: 09/29/2017; Received: 09/29/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Torrenzano, J.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less