Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 04/07/2020 at 21:18:50 (UTC).

DAVID RAMIREZ NAVARRETE v. AIMCO 173 EAST 90TH STREET, LLC, et al

Case Summary

On 09/28/2017 DAVID RAMIREZ NAVARRETE filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against AIMCO 173 EAST 90TH STREET, LLC. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/28/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Ramirez Navarrete

Defendants and Petitioners

AIMCO 173 EAST 90TH STREET, LLC,

Iron Work's Fe Corp.

POFI Construction Corp.

Defendant and Respondent

POFI Construction Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DIAMOND, BETH MICHELLE

Attorney at WILLIAM SCHWITZER & ASSOCIATES, P.C.

Petitioner Attorney

RENEE ANN FATOVIC

Defendant Attorneys

FATOVIC, RENEE ANN

Attorney at Price, Meese, Shulman & D'Arminio, P.C.

CONNOR, JAMESON PATRICK

Attorney at McMahon, Martine & Gallagher

Respondent Attorney

KRISTINA MARIE SCOTTO KRISTINA MICHELLE DROLET JAMESON PATRICK CONNOR

 

Court Documents

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE

URGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Affidavit of Meit

EXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Affidavit of Meit; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Good Faith Letter - IRON WORKS

EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Good Faith Letter - IRON WORKS; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) AOS on IRON WORKS

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) AOS on IRON WORKS; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Second TP Summons and Complaint against IRON WORKS

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Second TP Summons and Complaint against IRON WORKS; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Verified Answer to Third Party Complaint- POFI

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Verified Answer to Third Party Complaint- POFI; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

STIPULATION - VENUE STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE TO NEW YORK COUNTY

STIPULATION - VENUE STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE TO NEW YORK COUNTY; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK

NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 10/19/2017; Received: 10/19/2017

DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL

DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketURGENT - COURT APPEARANCE UPDATE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/19/2020; Received: 03/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H (Motion #002) Affidavit of Meit; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #002) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Good Faith Letter - IRON WORKS; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) AOS on IRON WORKS; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Second TP Summons and Complaint against IRON WORKS; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Verified Answer to Third Party Complaint- POFI; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) TP Summons and Complaint against POFI; Filed By: Connor, J.; Filed: 02/13/2020; Received: 02/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
57 More Docket Entries
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - VENUE STIPULATION TO CHANGE VENUE TO NEW YORK COUNTY; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK CPLR 8019(C) NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIRMATION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER VERIFIED ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 10/27/2017; Received: 10/27/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 10/19/2017; Received: 10/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL; Filed By: Fatovic, R.; Filed: 10/17/2017; Received: 10/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Diamond, B. - filed by united process service, inc.; Filed: 10/12/2017; Received: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Diamond, B.; Filed: 09/28/2017; Received: 09/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less