This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 22:15:58 (UTC).

DAVID R. COSME v. JEFFREY GREEN JR. et al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 DAVID R COSME filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JEFFREY GREEN JR. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Mary Ann Brigantti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Mary Ann Brigantti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David R. Cosme

Defendants

UNION LEASING TRUST

HUBBELL INCORPORATED

Jeffrey Green JR.

Patrick Smyth

Kathleen C. Smyth

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BESPECHNY, ALEXANDER

Attorney at ALEXANDER BESPECHNY, ATTORNEY AT LAW

Defendant Attorneys

HARPER, ROSE MAUREEN

Attorney at Burke, Conway & Dillon Employees of Liberty Mutual Group, Inc.

EMERENINI, CHIKODI EBERE

Attorney at Burke, Conway & Dillon

SHUTER, MICHALINA NATALIA

Attorney at Keane & Bernheimer, PLLC

 

Court Documents

ANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint

ANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Emerenini, C.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

ORDER - OTHER DATED 12/3/2019

ORDER - OTHER DATED 12/3/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 12/03/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 12/03/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Authorization for 21st Century Insurance Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Authorization for 21st Century Insurance Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Plaintiff's 8/27/19 Response

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Plaintiff's 8/27/19 Response; Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Defendant's 4/23/19 Demand for Discovery & Inspection

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Defendant's 4/23/19 Demand for Discovery & Inspection; Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shuter, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Shuter, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer & Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer & Demands; Filed By: Shuter, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service re JEffrey Green Jr

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service re JEffrey Green Jr; Filed By: Bespechny, A. - filed by Bonafide Process Service; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of svce re Kathleen Smyth

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of svce re Kathleen Smyth; Filed By: Bespechny, A. - filed by Bonafide Process Service; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bespechny, A. - filed by Bonafide Process Service; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service re Union Leasing Trust

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service re Union Leasing Trust; Filed By: Bespechny, A. - filed by Bonafide Process Service; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service re Hubbel Incorporated

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service re Hubbel Incorporated; Filed By: Bespechny, A. - filed by Bonafide Process Service; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

35 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer to Amended Complaint; Filed By: Emerenini, C.; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER DATED 12/3/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/20/2019; Received: 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) SHORT FORM ORDER DATED 12/03/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2019; Received: 12/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Authorization for 21st Century Insurance Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #002) Plaintiff's 8/27/19 Response; Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #002) Defendant's 4/23/19 Demand for Discovery & Inspection; Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #002) Plaintiff's Verified Bill of Particulars; Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #002); Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 11/27/2019; Received: 11/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Shuter, M.; Filed: 10/25/2019; Received: 10/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Shuter, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shuter, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Shuter, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Answer & Demands; Filed By: Shuter, M.; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service re JEffrey Green Jr; Filed By: Bespechny, A. - filed by Bonafide Process Service; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of svce re Kathleen Smyth; Filed By: Bespechny, A. - filed by Bonafide Process Service; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Bespechny, A. - filed by Bonafide Process Service; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service re Union Leasing Trust; Filed By: Bespechny, A. - filed by Bonafide Process Service; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aff of service re Hubbel Incorporated; Filed By: Bespechny, A. - filed by Bonafide Process Service; Filed: 03/15/2019; Received: 03/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Bespechny, A.; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less