This case was last updated from Broome County Courts on 11/16/2021 at 20:08:46 (UTC).

David H Cohen et al v. Kathy L Paugh et al

Case Summary

On 01/11/2021 David H Cohen filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Kathy L Paugh. This case was filed in Broome County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Oliver N Blaise Iii. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********0072

  • Filing Date:

    01/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Broome, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Oliver N Blaise Iii

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

CZAL LLC

DBA Tri Cities Apartment Rentals

David H Cohen

Defendants

Kathy L Paugh

Paugh Kathy Calabrese

Kathy L Calabrese

Kathy C Paugh

Kathy Calabresepaugh

Kathy C Snow

Kathie A Paugh

Kathie Cohen

Kathy C Cohen

Kathy L Cohen

Kathy Snow

Kathy Paugh-calabrese

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

PAUTZ, DANIEL JOHN

Attorney at BOND SCHOENECK & KING PLLC

COHEN, DAVID HARRY

Attorney at David H Cohen

Defendant Attorney

SAITTA, THOMAS A.

Attorney at ASWAD & INGRAHAM

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 01/11/2021; Received: 01/11/2021

NOTICE OF PENDENCY

NOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 01/11/2021; Received: 01/11/2021

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 01/11/2021; Received: 01/11/2021

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 01/11/2021; Received: 01/11/2021

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) First time upload not correct

COMPLAINT (AMENDED) First time upload not correct; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 01/26/2021; Received: 01/26/2021

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 01/26/2021; Received: 01/26/2021

ADMISSION OF SERVICE

ADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 02/03/2021; Received: 02/03/2021

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Saitta, T.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of service

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of service; Filed By: Saitta, T.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 03/05/2021; Received: 03/05/2021

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 03/05/2021; Received: 03/05/2021

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Saitta, T.; Filed: 08/06/2021; Received: 08/06/2021

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Saitta, T.; Filed: 08/06/2021; Received: 08/06/2021

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Pautz, D.; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/10/2021; Received: 08/10/2021

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2021; Received: 08/20/2021

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/08/2021; Received: 10/08/2021

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/08/2021; Received: 10/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/20/2021; Received: 08/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT JUDICIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/10/2021; Received: 08/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI); Filed By: Pautz, D.; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Saitta, T.; Filed: 08/06/2021; Received: 08/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Saitta, T.; Filed: 08/06/2021; Received: 08/06/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 03/05/2021; Received: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 03/05/2021; Received: 03/05/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of service; Filed By: Saitta, T.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Saitta, T.; Filed: 02/17/2021; Received: 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADMISSION OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 02/03/2021; Received: 02/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 01/26/2021; Received: 01/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT (AMENDED) First time upload not correct; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 01/26/2021; Received: 01/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 01/11/2021; Received: 01/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 01/11/2021; Received: 01/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 01/11/2021; Received: 01/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Cohen, D.; Filed: 01/11/2021; Received: 01/11/2021

    Read MoreRead Less