This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/26/2020 at 19:41:15 (UTC).

DAVID FLEET v. NEW YORK CITY HEALTH AND HOSPITALS CORPORATION,

Case Summary

On 04/18/2019 DAVID FLEET filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against NEW YORK CITY HEALTH AND HOSPITALS CORPORATION. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is George J. Silver - Mmc. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

George J. Silver - Mmc

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Fleet

Defendant

NEW YORK CITY HEALTH AND HOSPITALS CORPORATION,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHIFREN, ELYSSA

Attorney at Sullivan Papain Block McGrath & Cannavo

Defendant Attorneys

DOLGOW, MICHAEL BENJAMIN

Attorney at Kaufman Borgeest & Ryan LLP

CAVALLARO, JACQUELINE

Attorney at NYC HEALTH & HOSPITALS CORPORATION

KEEGAN, JULIE ANN

Attorney at Kaufman, Borgeest & Ryan LLP

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: JANUARY 15, 2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: JANUARY 15, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 10/30/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 10/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Dolgow, M.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 7/24/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 7/24/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Medical Malpractice and RJI

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Medical Malpractice and RJI; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Pleadings

EXHIBIT(S) - B Pleadings; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Medical Exchange Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A Medical Exchange Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE

NOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

ANSWER HHC answer

ANSWER HHC answer; Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: JANUARY 15, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/04/2020; Received: 02/04/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 10/30/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/13/2019; Received: 11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Dolgow, M.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 7/24/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service of Notice of Medical Malpractice and RJI; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Pleadings; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Medical Exchange Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDICAL MALPRACTICE; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 06/07/2019; Received: 06/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER HHC answer; Filed By: Cavallaro, J.; Filed: 05/02/2019; Received: 05/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 05/01/2019; Received: 05/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Shifren, E.; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less