This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/27/2020 at 14:22:21 (UTC).

DAVID C. SMITH v. ELEZABETH A. MILLER

Case Summary

On 04/28/2019 DAVID C SMITH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ELEZABETH A MILLER. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is John R Higgitt. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

John R Higgitt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David C. Smith

Defendant

Elezabeth A. Miller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

FRIEDMAN, ANDREW MICHAEL

Attorney at FRIEDMAN SANCHEZ, LLP

SANCHEZ, EMIL J

Attorney at FRIEDMAN SANCHEZ, LLP

Defendant Attorney

VICARIO, MICHAEL A.

Attorney at Law Office of Dennis C. Bartling

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: JANUARY 31, 2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: JANUARY 31, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED SEPT 13,2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED SEPT 13,2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 07/12/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 07/12/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sanchez, E.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Sanchez, E.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL Demand to Change Venue

DEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL Demand to Change Venue; Filed By: Vicario, M. - filed by GEICO; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Vicario, M. - filed by GEICO; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Vicario, M. - filed by GEICO; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Friedman, A.; Filed: 04/28/2019; Received: 04/28/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: JANUARY 31, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED SEPT 13,2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 07/12/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sanchez, E.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Sanchez, E.; Filed: 06/28/2019; Received: 06/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR CHANGE OF PLACE OF TRIAL Demand to Change Venue; Filed By: Vicario, M. - filed by GEICO; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Vicario, M. - filed by GEICO; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Vicario, M. - filed by GEICO; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Friedman, A.; Filed: 04/28/2019; Received: 04/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less