Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Orange County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 19:36:32 (UTC).

David Brodsky v. Lalima's Bakery LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2019 David Brodsky filed an Other lawsuit against Lalima's Bakery LLC. This case was filed in Orange County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Elaine Slobod. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Orange County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Orange, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Elaine Slobod

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

David Brodsky

Defendants

Lalima's Bakery LLC

Patriot Electric & Generator Co., LLC

S&M Construction and Landscaping Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OHLIGER, JASON ROBERT

Attorney at WEINSTEIN, ZIMMERMAN & OHLIGER

Defendant Attorney

MATHLESS, SCOTT L.

Attorney at Buratti, Rothenberg, & Burns

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ENTRY

NOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Mathless, S. - filed by Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1)

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Exhibits

AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Exhibits; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mathless, S. - filed by Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

ANSWER Verified Answer, Demand for a VBOP, Combined Demands

ANSWER Verified Answer, Demand for a VBOP, Combined Demands; Filed By: Mathless, S. - filed by Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

DEMAND FOR: Request to Enter Default

DEMAND FOR: Request to Enter Default; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

DEMAND FOR: Request to Enter Default

DEMAND FOR: Request to Enter Default; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mathless, S. - filed by Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER

STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Mathless, S. - filed by Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY; Filed By: Mathless, S. - filed by Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 08/08/2019; Received: 08/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) Exhibits; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mathless, S. - filed by Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer, Demand for a VBOP, Combined Demands; Filed By: Mathless, S. - filed by Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 04/19/2019; Received: 04/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Request to Enter Default; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR: Request to Enter Default; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Mathless, S. - filed by Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER; Filed By: Mathless, S. - filed by Buratti, Rothenberg & Burns; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 03/05/2019; Received: 03/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ohliger, J.; Filed: 02/18/2019; Received: 02/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less