This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 23:20:29 (UTC).

Danielle Haupt - v. - Liberty Management of Metropolitan New York, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/11/2017 Danielle Haupt filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Liberty Management of Metropolitan New York, Inc. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Danielle Haupt

Defendants

Liberty Management of Metropolitan New York, Inc.

Liberty Behavioral Management, Corp.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CASSISI, FRANK JOSEPH

Attorney at CASSISI AND CASSISI, PC

Defendant Attorney

RUTHERFORD, DAVID S

Attorney at RUTHERFORD & CHRISTIE, LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE

--none--

STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)

--none--

STIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

--none--

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

--none--

AFFIDAVIT

Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S)

Initial Summons & Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S)

Answer to Amended Verified Complaint

EXHIBIT(S)

Amended Summons & Amended Verified Complaint

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

Affirmation in Support of Motion to Dismiss

NOTICE OF MOTION

Notice of Motion

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF COMPLIANCE; Filed By: Cassisi, F.; Filed: 04/19/2018; Received: 04/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Cassisi, F.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - WITHDRAWING MOTION/ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #001); Filed By: Cassisi, F.; Filed: 06/16/2017; Received: 06/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Cassisi, F.; Filed: 05/25/2017; Received: 05/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A) (Motion #001); Filed By: Rutherford, D.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Rutherford, D.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Rutherford, D.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Initial Summons & Verified Complaint; Filed By: Rutherford, D.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Answer to Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Rutherford, D.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Amended Summons & Amended Verified Complaint; Filed By: Rutherford, D.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001) Affirmation in Support of Motion to Dismiss; Filed By: Rutherford, D.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Rutherford, D.; Filed: 05/24/2017; Received: 05/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Cassisi, F.; Filed: 05/11/2017; Received: 05/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less