Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from New York County Courts on 03/28/2020 at 17:33:24 (UTC).

DANIEL SIMON as Administrator for the Estate of SUSAN K. SIMON - v. - ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, Individually and as Successor in Interest to ROSTONE CORPORATION et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2017 DANIEL SIMON as Administrator for the Estate of SUSAN K SIMON filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, Individually and as Successor in Interest to ROSTONE CORPORATION. This case was filed in New York County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • Court:

    New York County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    New York, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL SIMON as Administrator for the Estate of SUSAN K. SIMON

Defendants

JOHNSON CONTROLS, INC.

ROGERS CORPORATION

CYTEC INDUSTRIES, INC., Individually and as Successor in Interest to FIBERITE, INC.

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, a North Carolina Limited Liability Company

UNION CARBIDE CORPORATION

GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY

EATON CORPORATION, as successor in interest to CUTLER-HAMMER, INC.

GRINNELL LLC

DUREZ CORPORATION

FOSTER WHEELER, L.L.C.

RSCC WIRE & CABLE, LLC

GOULDS PUMPS, INC.

GEORGIA-PACIFIC LLC, a Delaware Limited Liability Company

PLASTICS ENGINEERING COMPANY

CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a VIACOM INC., successor by merger to CBS CORPORATION, f/k/a WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORPORATION

ALLEN-BRADLEY COMPANY, Individually and as Successor in Interest to ROSTONE CORPORATION

HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL, INC., f/k/a ALLIED SIGNAL, INC. / BENDIX

YORK INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION, as Successor in Interest to YORK CORPORATION

MINNESOTA MINING & MANUFACTURING COMPANY, a/k/a 3M COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SHUKLA, KUSH

Attorney at Kush Shukla

MEIROWITZ, SAMUEL MILES

Attorney at Meirowitz & Wasserberg, LLP

WASSERBERG, DANIEL JOSHUA

Attorney at Meirowitz & Wasserberg, LLP

SHUSTERMAN, PERRY LEIGH

Attorney at MEIROWITZ & WASSERBERG, LLP

Defendant Attorneys

LAUTENBACH, ELIZABETH MARIE

Attorney at Hoagland, Longo, Moran, Dunst & Doukas LLP

HUGHES, BETH LYNN

Attorney at MORGAN, LEWIS & BOCKIUS

SCHOLZ, ANDREW J

Attorney at GOLDBERG SEGALLA LLP

DWYER, ELIZABETH MEGHAN

Attorney at Barclay Damon, LLP

LEE, LAWRENCE G.

Attorney at LYNCH DASKAL EMERY LLP

TANENBAUM, MICHAEL A

Attorney at Tanenbaum Keale LLP

FERSTENDIG, GABRIEL GERSHON

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP

FEROLETO, KATHLEEN THERESE

Attorney at McElroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter LLP

YOUNG, CINDY

Attorney at Heidell, Pittoni, Murphy & Bach, LLP

GILPATRICK, BRUCE F

Attorney at HEIDELL, PITTONI, MURPHY & BACH, LLP

MUNDO, ANDREW JOHN

Attorney at Lynch Daskal Emery LLP

BANDLAMUDI, RAGHU N

Attorney at CULLEN AND DYKMAN

MASINO, MICHAEL J

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

LASALA, JOSEPH P

Attorney at MCELROY, DEUTSCH & MULVANEY & CARPENTER, LLP

PUGLIESE, DONALD R

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

MCHUGH, TIMOTHY J

Attorney at LAVIN, CEDRONE, GRAVER, BOYD & DISIPIO

2 More Attorneys Available

 

Court Documents

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) RSCC Wire & Cable LLC's Unopposed Summary Judgment Motion and Order

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) RSCC Wire & Cable LLC's Unopposed Summary Judgment Motion and Order; Filed By: Mundo, A.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY 3M dismissal

NOTICE OF ENTRY 3M dismissal; Filed By: Mchugh, T.; Filed: 07/16/2019; Received: 07/16/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) 3M

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) 3M; Filed By: Mchugh, T.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry - USJM - Cytec

NOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry - USJM - Cytec; Filed By: Snider, C.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) proposed USJM - Cytec

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) proposed USJM - Cytec; Filed By: Snider, C.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED)

ORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Dwyer, E.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

ORDER - OTHER

ORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2018; Received: 12/12/2018

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

ANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt

ANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed By: Lasala, J.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Plastics Engineering Company

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Plastics Engineering Company; Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wasserberg, D.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

51 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) RSCC Wire & Cable LLC's Unopposed Summary Judgment Motion and Order; Filed By: Mundo, A.; Filed: 08/28/2019; Received: 08/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY 3M dismissal; Filed By: Mchugh, T.; Filed: 07/16/2019; Received: 07/16/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/03/2019; Received: 07/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) 3M; Filed By: Mchugh, T.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Notice of Entry - USJM - Cytec; Filed By: Snider, C.; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/04/2019; Received: 04/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED) proposed USJM - Cytec; Filed By: Snider, C.; Filed: 03/28/2019; Received: 03/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - NO OPP SUMMARY JUDGMENT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Dwyer, E.; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2018; Received: 12/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/12/2018; Received: 12/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 09/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/11/2017; Received: 09/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • DocketANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt of Eaton Corporation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Meirowitz, S.; Filed: 09/08/2017; Received: 09/08/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Acknowledgement of Receipt; Filed By: Lasala, J.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Plastics Engineering Company; Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 09/06/2017; Received: 09/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Wasserberg, D.; Filed: 08/25/2017; Received: 08/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less