This case was last updated from Monroe County Courts on 03/11/2021 at 03:18:09 (UTC).

Daniel K. Scott et al v. Laird Plastics, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 01/10/2020 Daniel K Scott filed a Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability lawsuit against Laird Plastics, Inc. This case was filed in Monroe County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judges overseeing this case are John J Ark and Erin P Gall. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0381

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Asbestos Product Liability

  • County, State:

    Monroe, New York

Judge Details

Judges

John J Ark

Erin P Gall

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Daniel K. Scott

Kim A. Scott his spouse

Defendants

Laird Plastics, Inc. f/k/a Almac Plastics, Inc.

R.E. Hebert and Company, Inc.

RA Products, Inc. f/k/a Cadillac Plastic & Chemical Company

INSULATION DISTRIBUTORS INC

ROCHESTER INDUSTRIAL INSULATION INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PONTERIO, MICHAEL ANTHONY

Attorney at LIPSITZ, PONTERIO & COMERFORD, LLC

Defendant Attorneys

MASINO, MICHAEL J

Attorney at HARRIS BEACH PLLC

NEMETH, MARK STEPHEN

Attorney at FELDMAN KIEFFER, LLP

TEMPESTA, CAROL MARIA

Attorney at Marks O'Neill O'Brien Courtney & Doherty

SNIDER, CAROL GUCK

Attorney at BARCLAY DAMON LLP

HULL, RONALD GEORGE

Attorney at Heisman Nunes & Hull LLP

 

Court Documents

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Trial Note of Issue

NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Trial Note of Issue; Filed By: Ponterio, M.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING

First Amended Discovery Scheduling Order

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

Enclosing proposed First Amended Discovery Scheduling Order

EXHIBIT(S)

Picture

EXHIBIT(S)

Picture

EXHIBIT(S)

Affidavit

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

Plaintiffs Response to RE Hebert PID letter

DEMAND FOR:

PID Ltr to Plaintiff for Hebert

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

Answer to Amended Complaint on behalf of RII

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

Affidavit of Service

ANSWER

Answer to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint served on behalf of R.E. HEBERT AND COMPANY, INC

STIPULATION - AMENDING PLEADING(S)

--none--

SUMMONS-SUPPLEMENTAL (POST RJI)

Supplemental Summons

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)

Laird Plastics, Inc.

ORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING

Scheduling Order

LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE

--none--

ANSWER

--none--

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY Trial Note of Issue; Filed By: Ponterio, M.; Filed: 01/29/2021; Received: 01/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING First Amended Discovery Scheduling Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/16/2020; Received: 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) First Amended Discovery Scheduling Order; Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 10/16/2020; Received: 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Enclosing proposed First Amended Discovery Scheduling Order; Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 10/16/2020; Received: 10/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - J Supplemental Witness Affidavit; Filed By: Ponterio, M.; Filed: 09/11/2020; Received: 09/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - I Report of Analysis Un-Redactedper 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ponterio, M.; Filed: 09/11/2020; Received: 09/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - H Picture; Filed By: Ponterio, M.; Filed: 09/11/2020; Received: 09/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Dr. Utell Report Un-Redactedper 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ponterio, M.; Filed: 09/11/2020; Received: 09/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Transcript Un-Redactedper 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ponterio, M.; Filed: 09/11/2020; Received: 09/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E highlighted map; Filed By: Ponterio, M.; Filed: 09/11/2020; Received: 09/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) Laird Plastics, Inc.; Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 02/25/2020; Received: 02/25/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - TRIAL SCHEDULING Scheduling Order; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/24/2020; Received: 02/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) proposed Discovery Scheduling Order; Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE; Filed By: Masino, M.; Filed: 02/21/2020; Received: 02/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint served on behalf of R. E. Hebert and Company, Inc.; Filed By: Nemeth, M.; Filed: 02/18/2020; Received: 02/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Tempesta, C.; Filed: 02/10/2020; Received: 02/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/14/2020; Received: 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Ponterio, M.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ponterio, M.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less