This case was last updated from Rockland County Courts on 02/17/2020 at 18:26:46 (UTC).

DANIEL E BERTOLINO PC - v. - GARY POITEVIEN et al

Case Summary

On 07/05/2017 DANIEL E BERTOLINO PC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against GARY POITEVIEN. This case was filed in Rockland County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    07/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Rockland County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Rockland, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

DANIEL E BERTOLINO PC

Defendants

Daniella Poitevien

Gary Poitevien

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STEIN, WILLIAM M

Attorney at STEIN & STEIN

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Daniella Poitevien - Decision and Order

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Daniella Poitevien - Decision and Order; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Gary Poitevien - Decision and Order

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Gary Poitevien - Decision and Order; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

ANSWER

ANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/10/2018; Received: 04/10/2018

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Judgment

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Judgment; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 28, 2017

JUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 28, 2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DANIELLA POITEVIEN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DANIELLA POITEVIEN; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GARY POITEVIEN

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GARY POITEVIEN; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Daniella Poitevien - Decision and Order; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Gary Poitevien - Decision and Order; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/26/2018; Received: 09/26/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 07/09/2018; Received: 07/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/12/2018; Received: 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/10/2018; Received: 04/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #001) Affidavits of Service; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Subpoena OF DANIELLA POITEVIEN; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Subpoena OF GARY POITEVIEN; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Judgment; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 03/14/2018; Received: 03/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT JUDGMENT entered in the office of the County Clerk on August 28, 2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION NON MILITARY AFFIRMATION Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 08/28/2017; Received: 08/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE DANIELLA POITEVIEN; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE GARY POITEVIEN; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 07/14/2017; Received: 07/14/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Stein, W.; Filed: 07/05/2017; Received: 07/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less