This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 06/26/2020 at 04:58:26 (UTC).

DANIEL DEJESUS - v. - PETER ACOSTA JR. et al

Case Summary

On 05/19/2017 DANIEL DEJESUS filed an Other lawsuit against PETER ACOSTA JR. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Pamela Fisher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    05/19/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Pamela Fisher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Daniel Dejesus

Defendants

Gerrianne Murray

Peter Acosta JR.

Peter J. Acosta

Robert G. Murray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LANE, STEVEN THOMAS

Attorney at Constantinidis & Associates P.C

CONSTANTINIDIS, GUS JOHN

Attorney at CONSTANTINIDIS & ASSOCIATES P.C.

ALFISI, MARK ANTHONY

Attorney at Robert K. Young & Associates

CHAN, NICOLE CHEALISSE

Attorney at Robert K. Young and Associates

Defendant Attorneys

BURNS, PATRICK STEVEN

Attorney at JAMES F. BUTLER & ASSOCIATES

FIORETTI, KATHLEEN E

Attorney at RICHARD T. LAU & ASSOCIATES, ATTORNEY AT LAW

 

Court Documents

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Alfisi, M.; Filed: 06/22/2020; Received: 06/22/2020

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Chan, N.; Filed: 06/22/2020; Received: 06/22/2020

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Burns, P.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Constantinidis, G.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANS & Cross-Claim with Demands

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANS & Cross-Claim with Demands; Filed By: Burns, P.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

ORDER - OTHER dated 11/27/2019

ORDER - OTHER dated 11/27/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Constantinidis, G.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #2) dated 12/12/18

ORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #2) dated 12/12/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/24/2018; Received: 01/02/2019

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Affidavit of Peter Acosta, Jr. & License Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Affidavit of Peter Acosta, Jr. & License Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - 643 E. 13th Street, 3F, New York, NY

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - 643 E. 13th Street, 3F, New York, NY; Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - 320 Covert Street, Brooklyn, NY

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - 320 Covert Street, Brooklyn, NY; Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Plaintiff Fax Sheet re Summons & Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Plaintiff Fax Sheet re Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Police Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Police Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Dismiss In Lieu of Answer

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Dismiss In Lieu of Answer; Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Constantinidis, G.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Alfisi, M.; Filed: 06/22/2020; Received: 06/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Chan, N.; Filed: 06/22/2020; Received: 06/22/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Burns, P.; Filed: 02/27/2020; Received: 02/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Constantinidis, G.; Filed: 01/10/2020; Received: 01/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANS & Cross-Claim with Demands; Filed By: Burns, P.; Filed: 12/23/2019; Received: 12/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER dated 11/27/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/17/2019; Received: 12/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE; Filed By: Constantinidis, G.; Filed: 01/04/2019; Received: 01/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - DEFAULT JUDGMENT (Motion #2) dated 12/12/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/24/2018; Received: 01/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/10/2018; Received: 10/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER JHO ORD 08/01/18 SIGNED BY HON KNIPEL HEARING TO BE HELD IN JHOPART 82 RM 482 11/15/18 9:30AM FAILURE TO APPEAR WILL RESULT IN A DEFAULT.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/25/2018; Received: 09/25/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) DMV printout Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) Affidavit of Peter Acosta, Jr. & License Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - 643 E. 13th Street, 3F, New York, NY; Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service - 320 Covert Street, Brooklyn, NY; Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Plaintiff Fax Sheet re Summons & Complaint; Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Police Accident Report Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion to Dismiss In Lieu of Answer; Filed By: Vaysberg, A.; Filed: 02/01/2018; Received: 02/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Constantinidis, G.; Filed: 05/19/2017; Received: 05/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less