This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 02/24/2020 at 12:32:14 (UTC).

D H et al v. 2268 BRONX EQUITIES LLC et al

Case Summary

On 03/22/2019 D H filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against 2268 BRONX EQUITIES LLC. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald Miles. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******019E

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Donald Miles

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Darshell Hines individually

D H an infant by DARSHELL HINES, her mother and natural guardian

Defendants

2268 BRONX EQUITIES LLC

TOWER MANAGEMENT GROUP LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KERNER, KENNETH TODD

Attorney at KERNER & KERNER, P.C.

Defendant Attorney

CIOCI, SUSAN ANN

Attorney at Gannon, Rosenfarb & Drossman

 

Court Documents

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: FEBRUARY 3, 2020

STIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: FEBRUARY 3, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 10/16/2019

ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 10/16/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 7/3/2019.

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 7/3/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 06/27/2019

NOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 06/27/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kerner, K.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

ANSWER Answer & Demands

ANSWER Answer & Demands; Filed By: Cioci, S.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Tower

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Tower; Filed By: Kerner, K.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - 2268 Bronx Equities

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - 2268 Bronx Equities; Filed By: Kerner, K.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kerner, K.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SO ORDERED DATED: FEBRUARY 3, 2020; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/11/2020; Received: 02/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE DATED 10/16/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE DATED 7/3/2019.; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/26/2019; Received: 07/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE 06/27/2019; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/10/2019; Received: 06/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Kerner, K.; Filed: 06/06/2019; Received: 06/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer & Demands; Filed By: Cioci, S.; Filed: 05/10/2019; Received: 05/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - Tower; Filed By: Kerner, K.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service - 2268 Bronx Equities; Filed By: Kerner, K.; Filed: 04/01/2019; Received: 04/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Kerner, K.; Filed: 03/22/2019; Received: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less