This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 10/13/2021 at 09:51:46 (UTC).

D. G. v. CITY OF NEW YORK et al

Case Summary

On 08/02/2021 D G filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF NEW YORK. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is George J. Silver. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2021

  • Filing Date:

    08/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

George J. Silver

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

D. G.

Defendants

CITY OF NEW YORK

PIUS XII YOUTH AND FAMILY SERVICES, INC.

CONGREGATION OF HOLY CROSS UNITED STATES PROVINCE OF PRIESTS AND BROTHERS f/k/a CONGREGATION OF HOLY CROSS EASTERN PROVINCE OF PRIESTS AND BROTHERS

CONGREGATION OF HOLY CROSS INDIANA PROVINCE OF PRIESTS AND BROTHERS

CONGREGATION OF HOLY CROSS MOREAU PROVINCE OF PRIESTS AND BROTHERS

ARCHDIOCESE OF NEW YORK

CATHOLIC CHARITIES OF THE ARCHDIOCESE OF NEW YORK

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DUQUIN, SCOTT MICHAEL

Attorney at Herman Law

Defendant Attorneys

CALISTRO, PHYLLIS GAIL

Attorney at NEW YORK CITY LAW DEPARTMENT

ROLLE, LISA M

Attorney at TRAUB LIEBERMAN STRAUS & SHREWSBERRY

 

Court Documents

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANSWER w/CrossClaims on behalf of City of NY

ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANSWER w/CrossClaims on behalf of City of NY; Filed By: Calistro, P.; Filed: 09/20/2021; Received: 09/20/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/08/2021; Received: 09/08/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/08/2021; Received: 09/08/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver

ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #1 Hon. George J. Silver

ORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #1 Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Corrected

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Corrected; Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) *Corrected* OSC(proposed)

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) *Corrected* OSC(proposed); Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)

ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affirmation

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affirmation; Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

COMPLAINT Complaint

COMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

SUMMONS Summons

SUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S) ANSWER w/CrossClaims on behalf of City of NY; Filed By: Calistro, P.; Filed: 09/20/2021; Received: 09/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/08/2021; Received: 09/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 09/08/2021; Received: 09/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Duquin, S. - filed by PM Legal; Filed: 08/24/2021; Received: 08/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CONFIDENTIALITY ORDER: Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #2 Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - ADMINISTRATIVE CMO #1 Hon. George J. Silver; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/09/2021; Received: 08/09/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Corrected; Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/03/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A); Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP Affirmation; Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED) *Corrected* OSC(proposed); Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/03/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT Complaint; Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS Summons; Filed By: Duquin, S.; Filed: 08/02/2021; Received: 08/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less