Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Bronx County Courts on 04/16/2021 at 12:08:41 (UTC).

Cynthia Langston v. Anthony Duen-Camacho

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 Cynthia Langston filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Anthony Duen-Camacho. This case was filed in Bronx County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Bianka Perez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******020E

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Bronx County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Bronx, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Bianka Perez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cynthia Langston

Defendant

Anthony Duen-camacho

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VOZZA, Frank F

Attorney at Vozza & Huguenot

Defendant Attorney

GERTZER, MICHAEL KEITH

Attorney at Law Offices of Jennifer S. Adams

 

Court Documents

RESPONSE TO DEMAND discovery and inspection

RESPONSE TO DEMAND discovery and inspection; Filed By: Gertzer, M.; Filed: 04/01/2021; Received: 04/01/2021

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 3/19/2021

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 3/19/2021; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/23/2021; Received: 03/23/2021

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gertzer, M.; Filed: 01/28/2021; Received: 01/28/2021

ANSWER Answer & demands

ANSWER Answer & demands; Filed By: Gertzer, M.; Filed: 01/28/2021; Received: 01/28/2021

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vozza, F.; Filed: 08/20/2020; Received: 08/20/2020

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Vozza, F.; Filed: 07/01/2020; Received: 07/01/2020

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND discovery and inspection; Filed By: Gertzer, M.; Filed: 04/01/2021; Received: 04/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 3/19/2021; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/23/2021; Received: 03/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Gertzer, M.; Filed: 01/28/2021; Received: 01/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Answer & demands; Filed By: Gertzer, M.; Filed: 01/28/2021; Received: 01/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Vozza, F.; Filed: 08/20/2020; Received: 08/20/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Vozza, F.; Filed: 07/01/2020; Received: 07/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less