This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:49:51 (UTC).

Curtis Holmes et al - v. - Jean-Jacques Clevins

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 Curtis Holmes filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Jean-Jacques Clevins. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Curtis Holmes

Jacqueline A. Washington

Defendant

Jean-jacques Clevins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SELLS, DEREK

Attorney at THE COCHRAN FIRM

Defendant Attorneys

MORRISSEY, COLIN FRANCIS

Attorney at Colin F. Morrissey Esq/

ALBEE, CHRISTOPHER J

Attorney at VOTTO & ALBEE, PLLC

 

Court Documents

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)

CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Albee, C.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) dtd 11/28/18

ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) dtd 11/28/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2018; Received: 12/04/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Nosowitz, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 10/23/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Nosowitz, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 10/23/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Stipulation adjourning motion

STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Stipulation adjourning motion; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) medical reports

EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) medical reports; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Physician's Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Physician's Affirmation; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition to Motion for SJ

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition to Motion for SJ; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 09/29/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 09/29/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

ANSWER WITH DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS

ANSWER WITH DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sells, D. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sells, D. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI); Filed By: Albee, C.; Filed: 08/07/2019; Received: 08/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM (Motion #1) dtd 11/28/18; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/30/2018; Received: 12/04/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Nosowitz, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 10/23/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Nosowitz, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 10/23/2018; Received: 10/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Stipulation adjourning motion; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) medical reports; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Physician's Affirmation; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition to Motion for SJ; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 10/09/2018; Received: 10/09/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 04/05/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/05/2018; Received: 04/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated 09/29/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/03/2017; Received: 10/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Request for Judicial Intervention; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST Request for Preliminary Conference; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Morrissey, C. - filed by Baker, McEvoy, Morrissey & Moskovits, P.C; Filed: 07/19/2017; Received: 07/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Sells, D. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sells, D. - filed by GOTHAM PROCESS INC.; Filed: 06/19/2017; Received: 06/19/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT Summons and Verified Complaint; Filed By: Sells, D.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less