This case was last updated from Queens County Courts on 01/25/2023 at 22:35:53 (UTC).

CTF Asset Management, LLC v. Sharifan Bacchus et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2022 CTF Asset Management, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Sharifan Bacchus. This case was filed in Queens County Courts, Queens County Supreme Court Civil Term - 1 located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert Ian Caloras. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Queens, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Robert Ian Caloras

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CTF Asset Management, LLC

Defendants

Sharifan Bacchus

Ameer Bacchus

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

Capital One Bank (USA), N.A.

American Express Bank, FSB

John Doe

Mary Roe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ZORNEK, ANNA MICHELLE

SANDA, GREGORY JAMES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE Status Conference Notice

NOTICE Status Conference Notice; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2023; Received: 01/18/2023

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #001) Motion Submission Form

SUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #001) Motion Submission Form; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/12/2023; Received: 01/12/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/22/2022; Received: 12/22/2022

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) *Corrected*

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) *Corrected*

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Payment History Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Payment History Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) *Corrected*

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE

ORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2022; Received: 11/25/2022

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - F 90 Days

EXHIBIT(S) - F 90 Days; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - E Assignment

EXHIBIT(S) - E Assignment; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

27 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE Status Conference Notice; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/18/2023; Received: 01/18/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUPPORTING PAPERS TO MOTION (Motion #001) Motion Submission Form; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/12/2023; Received: 01/12/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/22/2022; Received: 12/22/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Payment History Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/20/2022; Received: 12/20/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - RESIDENTIAL FORECLOSURE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 11/25/2022; Received: 11/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ATTY(S) & DEFT(S); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2022; Received: 10/13/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F 90 Days; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Assignment; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 07/21/2022; Received: 07/21/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less