This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 01/07/2023 at 14:46:35 (UTC).

Crystal Gomez v. Brooklyn Events Center, LLC d/b/a Barclays Center et al

Case Summary

On 02/04/2022 Crystal Gomez filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Brooklyn Events Center, LLC d/b/a Barclays Center. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Kings County Supreme Court Civil Term located in Niagara, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Odessa Kennedy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    02/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Odessa Kennedy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crystal Gomez

Defendants

Brooklyn Events Center, LLC d/b/a Barclays Center

AEG Management Brooklyn, LLC

American Seating Company, Inc,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ELEFTERAKIS, NICHOLAS

TOBIAS, OLIVER RODERICK

AMATO, RYAN JOHN

MAGILL, MELISSA NICOLE

Defendant Attorneys

FINN, JAMES RAYMOND

SHARMA, SAHIL

ROLECKI, JOHN JOSEPH

BLACK, ANDREW SETH

 

Court Documents

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Black, A.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Black, A.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

DEMAND FOR:

DEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Black, A.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

RESPONSE TO DEMAND

RESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Black, A.; Filed: 12/29/2022; Received: 12/29/2022

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/05/2022; Received: 12/05/2022

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Magill, M.; Filed: 10/18/2022; Received: 10/18/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Magill, M.; Filed: 10/18/2022; Received: 10/18/2022

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith

AFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Magill, M.; Filed: 10/18/2022; Received: 10/18/2022

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Magill, M.; Filed: 10/18/2022; Received: 10/18/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 03/01/2022; Received: 03/01/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Elefterakis, N.; Filed: 02/04/2022; Received: 02/04/2022

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Black, A.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Black, A.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEMAND FOR:; Filed By: Black, A.; Filed: 12/30/2022; Received: 12/30/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO DEMAND; Filed By: Black, A.; Filed: 12/29/2022; Received: 12/29/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/05/2022; Received: 12/05/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Magill, M.; Filed: 10/18/2022; Received: 10/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Magill, M.; Filed: 10/18/2022; Received: 10/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Affirmation of Good Faith; Filed By: Magill, M.; Filed: 10/18/2022; Received: 10/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Magill, M.; Filed: 10/18/2022; Received: 10/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S); Filed By: Black, A.; Filed: 05/06/2022; Received: 05/06/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Filed By: Finn, J.; Filed: 03/15/2022; Received: 03/15/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 03/01/2022; Received: 03/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Elefterakis, N. - filed by PM LEGAL; Filed: 02/24/2022; Received: 02/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Elefterakis, N.; Filed: 02/04/2022; Received: 02/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less