This case was last updated from Kings County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 01:57:07 (UTC).

CRYSTAL BISPHAM - v. - YWCA BROOKLYN

Case Summary

On 06/05/2017 CRYSTAL BISPHAM filed an Other lawsuit against YWCA BROOKLYN. This case was filed in Kings County Courts, Supreme Court Civil Term located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Kings County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court Civil Term

  • County, State:

    Kings, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crystal Bispham as Administrator of the Estate of LIZA MILLET

Defendant

YWCA BROOKLYN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LANDERS, STANLEY ALLAN

Attorney at Landers & Cernigliaro, P.C.

Defendant Attorneys

MULDOON, THOMAS E

Attorney at BARRY MCTIERNAN & MOORE

SCHULTZ, DAVID H

Attorney at Barry McTiernan & Moore

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Photograph of Door

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Photograph of Door; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated:10/11/2017

ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated:10/11/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Landers, S. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Order being entered

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Order being entered; Filed By: Schultz, D.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Landers, S. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

ORDER - OTHER Dated 06/11/2018

ORDER - OTHER Dated 06/11/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing; Filed By: Muldoon, T. - filed by barry, mctiernan moore; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Amended Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Amended Complaint; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Schultz, D.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST

PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

ANSWER YWCA Brooklyn Answer

ANSWER YWCA Brooklyn Answer; Filed By: Muldoon, T. - filed by barry, mctiernan moore; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

BILL OF PARTICULARS

BILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Apartment Guidelines

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Apartment Guidelines; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Schultz, D.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Resp to Plaintiff's Notice D&I

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Resp to Plaintiff's Notice D&I Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Schultz, D.; Filed: 04/01/2018; Received: 04/01/2018

21 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Schultz, D.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Order being entered; Filed By: Schultz, D.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1); Filed By: Schultz, D.; Filed: 06/15/2018; Received: 06/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - OTHER Dated 06/11/2018; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 06/13/2018; Received: 06/14/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1); Filed By: Schultz, D.; Filed: 04/01/2018; Received: 04/01/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Amended Complaint; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Apartment Guidelines; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) Resp to Plaintiff's Notice D&I Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Photograph of Door; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Correspondence dated 1/29/18; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 03/07/2018; Received: 03/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 01/29/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 01/29/2018; Received: 01/29/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE Dated:10/11/2017; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/13/2017; Received: 10/25/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF PARTICULARS; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 08/16/2017; Received: 08/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Statement of Authorization for Electronic Filing; Filed By: Muldoon, T. - filed by barry, mctiernan moore; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER YWCA Brooklyn Answer; Filed By: Muldoon, T. - filed by barry, mctiernan moore; Filed: 08/11/2017; Received: 08/11/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Landers, S. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Landers, S. - filed by Interboro Attorney Service; Filed: 07/20/2017; Received: 07/20/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Landers, S.; Filed: 06/05/2017; Received: 06/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less