This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 02/16/2023 at 09:36:23 (UTC).

CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC v. WILLIAM C. ARCIPRETE JR. et al

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against WILLIAM C ARCIPRETE JR. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Niagara, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2023

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROSSCOUNTRY MORTGAGE, LLC

Defendants

William C. Arciprete JR. A/K/A WILLIAM ARCIPRETE

Devin Nicole Arciprete A/K/A DEVIN ARCIPRETE

WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

SUFFOLK COUNTY CLREK'S OFFICE

John Doe

Mary Doe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ROGERS, HEATHER C

ROGERS, HEATHER C M

Defendant Attorney

REID, DYLAN VINCENT

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT)

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT); Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT

CERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 EXHIBITS

EXHIBIT(S) - 1 EXHIBITS; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SUFFOLK COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SUFFOLK COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Reid, D.; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Supplemental DEVIN NICOLE ARCIPRETE A/K/A DEVIN ARCIPRETE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Supplemental DEVIN NICOLE ARCIPRETE A/K/A DEVIN ARCIPRETE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Supplemental WILLIAM C. ARCIPRETE, JR. A/K/A WILLIAM ARCIPRETE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Supplemental WILLIAM C. ARCIPRETE, JR. A/K/A WILLIAM ARCIPRETE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth form

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth form; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE S&C MAILING - WILLIAM C. ARCIPRETE, JR. A/K/A WILLIAM ARCIPRETE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE S&C MAILING - WILLIAM C. ARCIPRETE, JR. A/K/A WILLIAM ARCIPRETE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - WILLIAM C. ARCIPRETE, JR. A/K/A WILLIAM ARCIPRETE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - WILLIAM C. ARCIPRETE, JR. A/K/A WILLIAM ARCIPRETE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE S&C MAILING - DEVIN NICOLE ARCIPRETE A/K/A DEVIN ARCIPRETE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE S&C MAILING - DEVIN NICOLE ARCIPRETE A/K/A DEVIN ARCIPRETE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - DEVIN NICOLE ARCIPRETE A/K/A DEVIN ARCIPRETE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - DEVIN NICOLE ARCIPRETE A/K/A DEVIN ARCIPRETE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) DUE TO SYSTEM ERROR THIS IS THE FINAL NOTICE OF PENDENCY ORIGINALLY FILED AS DOCUMENT #2

NOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) DUE TO SYSTEM ERROR THIS IS THE FINAL NOTICE OF PENDENCY ORIGINALLY FILED AS DOCUMENT #2; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 02/15/2023

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - DEVIN NICOLE ARCIPRETE A/K/A DEVIN ARCIPRETE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE S&C MAILING - DEVIN NICOLE ARCIPRETE A/K/A DEVIN ARCIPRETE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - WILLIAM C. ARCIPRETE, JR. A/K/A WILLIAM ARCIPRETE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE S&C MAILING - WILLIAM C. ARCIPRETE, JR. A/K/A WILLIAM ARCIPRETE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 02/09/2023; Received: 02/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING Auth form; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Supplemental WILLIAM C. ARCIPRETE, JR. A/K/A WILLIAM ARCIPRETE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Supplemental DEVIN NICOLE ARCIPRETE A/K/A DEVIN ARCIPRETE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest, LLC; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/08/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI); Filed By: Reid, D.; Filed: 02/08/2023; Received: 02/08/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING AUTH FORM; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - SUFFOLK COUNTY CLERK'S OFFICE; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE - WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.; Filed By: Rogers, H. - filed by Provest LLC; Filed: 01/31/2023; Received: 01/31/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) DUE TO SYSTEM ERROR THIS IS THE FINAL NOTICE OF PENDENCY ORIGINALLY FILED AS DOCUMENT #2; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 02/15/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - 1 EXHIBITS; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (01 LOT) DUE TO SYSTEM ERROR SEE FINAL NOTICE OF PENDENCY FILED AT DOCUMENT #16; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Rogers, H.; Filed: 01/04/2023; Received: 01/04/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less