This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/22/2023 at 23:24:52 (UTC).

Crosscountry Mortgage, LLC v. SHAWN MONROE et al

Case Summary

On 12/01/2022 Crosscountry Mortgage, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SHAWN MONROE. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Greene, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crosscountry Mortgage, LLC

Defendants

Shawn Monroe

Melissa Kelly

John Doe #1 THROUGH # 50

Mary Roe #1 THROUGH # 50

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SANDA, GREGORY JAMES

ZORNEK, ANNA MICHELLE

 

Court Documents

COURT NOTICE

COURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/16/2023; Received: 02/16/2023

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/28/2022; Received: 12/28/2022

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/28/2022; Received: 12/28/2022

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE 1-50 ATTEMPTED

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE 1-50 ATTEMPTED; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MELISSA KELLY 3215 MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MELISSA KELLY 3215 MAILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MELISSA KELLY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MELISSA KELLY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHAWN MONROE 3215 MAILING

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHAWN MONROE 3215 MAILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHAWN MONROE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHAWN MONROE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - G Executor's Deed

EXHIBIT(S) - G Executor's Deed; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - F Decree Granting Probate & Certificate of Appointment of Executor

EXHIBIT(S) - F Decree Granting Probate & Certificate of Appointment of Executor; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - E AOM

EXHIBIT(S) - E AOM; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOURT NOTICE; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/16/2023; Received: 02/16/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/28/2022; Received: 12/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/28/2022; Received: 12/28/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE JOHN DOE 1-50 ATTEMPTED; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MELISSA KELLY 3215 MAILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE MELISSA KELLY Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHAWN MONROE 3215 MAILING; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE SHAWN MONROE Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PENDENCY (1 BLOCK); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/09/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G Executor's Deed; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Decree Granting Probate & Certificate of Appointment of Executor; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E AOM; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/01/2022; Received: 12/01/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less