This case was last updated from Queens County Courts on 02/25/2023 at 06:00:45 (UTC).

Crosscountry Mortgage, LLC v. Luis Molina et al

Case Summary

On 12/16/2022 Crosscountry Mortgage, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against Luis Molina. This case was filed in Queens County Courts, Queens County Supreme Court Civil Term - 1 located in Greene, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Karina E. Alomar. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2022

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Queens, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Karina E. Alomar

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Crosscountry Mortgage, LLC

Defendants

Luis Molina

New York State Department of Taxation and Finance

New York City Environmental Control Board

Criminal Court of Status of New York

John Doe

Mary Roe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SANDA, GREGORY JAMES

ZORNEK, ANNA MICHELLE

Defendant Attorney

KNIPENBERG, ALEXANDER

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/22/2023; Received: 02/22/2023

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)

REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/22/2023; Received: 02/22/2023

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)

ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Knipenberg, A.; Filed: 02/14/2023; Received: 02/14/2023

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ATTY(S) & DEFT(S)

NOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ATTY(S) & DEFT(S); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2023; Received: 01/30/2023

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for SRJI

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for SRJI; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/19/2023; Received: 01/19/2023

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) *Corrected*

ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/17/2023; Received: 01/20/2023

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE *Corrected*

RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/17/2023; Received: 01/20/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 01/09/2023; Received: 01/09/2023

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 01/09/2023; Received: 01/09/2023

EXHIBIT(S) - G 90 Days Possible SSN Administratively Redacted

EXHIBIT(S) - G 90 Days Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - F Assignment of Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - F Assignment of Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - E Mortgage

EXHIBIT(S) - E Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - D Merger Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - D Merger Documents; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note

EXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders

EXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties

EXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

COMPLAINT

COMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

SUMMONS

SUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/22/2023; Received: 02/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S); Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 02/22/2023; Received: 02/22/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S); Filed By: Knipenberg, A.; Filed: 02/14/2023; Received: 02/14/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ATTY(S) & DEFT(S); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/30/2023; Received: 01/30/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Service for SRJI; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/19/2023; Received: 01/19/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/17/2023; Received: 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE *Corrected*; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 01/17/2023; Received: 01/20/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE CRIMINAL COURT OF THE CITY OF NEW YORK; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 01/09/2023; Received: 01/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE NYC ENVIRONMENTAL CONTROL BOARD; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 01/09/2023; Received: 01/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OCCUPANT- 1303; Filed By: Zornek, A. - filed by ALSTATE PROCESS SERVICE INC.; Filed: 01/09/2023; Received: 01/09/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MERIT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G 90 Days Possible SSN Administratively Redacted; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Assignment of Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Mortgage; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Merger Documents; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Note; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Lienholders; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Parties; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS; Filed By: Sanda, G.; Filed: 12/16/2022; Received: 12/16/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less