Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 23:22:43 (UTC).

Credit Acceptance Corporation v. Victoria Arroyo

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 Credit Acceptance Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Victoria Arroyo. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Acceptance Corporation

Defendant

Victoria Arroyo aka Victoria J. Arroyo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUR, JOSEPH M

Attorney at RELIN GOLDSTEIN & CRANE LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of non-military

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of non-military; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavid of Compliance

AFFIDAVIT Affidavid of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS VICTORIA ARROYO

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS VICTORIA ARROYO; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of non-military; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavid of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS VICTORIA ARROYO; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/09/2019; Received: 09/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less