This case was last updated from Livingston County Courts on 02/07/2020 at 19:54:46 (UTC).

Credit Acceptance Corporation - v. - Marjorie L Barnhardt et al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2017 Credit Acceptance Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Marjorie L Barnhardt. This case was filed in Livingston County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Livingston, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Acceptance Corporation

Defendants

Shannon J Rizzo

Marjorie L Barnhardt

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SEA # 244494

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT SEA # 244494; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A SEA # 244494

EXHIBIT(S) - A SEA # 244494; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#244494

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#244494; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/07/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#244494; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 08/02/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 05/23/2017; Received: 05/23/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A SEA # 244494; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT SEA # 244494; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 04/25/2017; Received: 04/25/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less