This case was last updated from Livingston County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 20:13:41 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION v. Kevin Farrell et al

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Kevin Farrell. This case was filed in Livingston County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Livingston, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendants

Lauren Farrell

Kevin Farrell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#304296

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#304296; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

AFFIRMATION *Corrected*

AFFIRMATION *Corrected*; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/22/2019; Received: 05/22/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION *Corrected*; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) SEA#304296; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 05/20/2019; Received: 05/20/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 04/03/2019; Received: 04/03/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 03/12/2019; Received: 03/12/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less