This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/25/2020 at 17:27:54 (UTC).

Credit Acceptance Corporation v. Katelyn Burgasser et al

Case Summary

On 03/29/2019 Credit Acceptance Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Katelyn Burgasser. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0484

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Acceptance Corporation

Defendants

Katelyn Burgasser

Michelle Dunshie

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUR, JOSEPH M

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation of Facts

AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation of Facts; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Account/Facts

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Account/Facts; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non Military Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non Military Service; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation Statute of Limitation

AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation Statute of Limitation; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/25/2019; Received: 07/25/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation Statute of Limitation; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non Military Service; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Account/Facts; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation of Facts; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ABC Legal; Filed: 04/17/2019; Received: 04/17/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/29/2019; Received: 03/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less