Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 22:21:52 (UTC).

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION v. Joseph Luck

Case Summary

On 08/12/2019 CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Joseph Luck. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDIT ACCEPTANCE CORPORATION

Defendant

Joseph Luck

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EINSTEIN, STEPHEN

Attorney at STEPHEN EINSTEIN & ASSOCIATES P.C.

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/28/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/26/2019; Received: 10/26/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/26/2019; Received: 10/26/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/26/2019; Received: 10/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/26/2019; Received: 10/26/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) 326771

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) 326771; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/26/2019; Received: 10/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/28/2019; Received: 11/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/26/2019; Received: 10/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/26/2019; Received: 10/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/26/2019; Received: 10/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/26/2019; Received: 10/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) 326771; Filed By: Einstein, S.; Filed: 10/26/2019; Received: 10/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Einstein, S. - filed by Progressive Process Service; Filed: 08/12/2019; Received: 08/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less