Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 03/10/2020 at 12:34:59 (UTC).

Credit Acceptance Corporation v. James Chambers

Case Summary

On 08/01/2019 Credit Acceptance Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against James Chambers. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Suffolk County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Acceptance Corporation

Defendant

James Chambers

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUR, JOSEPH M

Attorney at RELIN GOLDSTEIN & CRANE LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non Military Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non Military Service; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation of Facts

AFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation of Facts; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JAMES CHAMBERS

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JAMES CHAMBERS; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non Military Service; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Attorney Affirmation of Facts; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS JAMES CHAMBERS; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 09/11/2019; Received: 09/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 08/01/2019; Received: 08/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less