This case was last updated from Suffolk County Courts on 04/06/2020 at 13:23:18 (UTC).

Credit Acceptance Corporation - v. - Earlette Jackson

Case Summary

On 09/21/2017 Credit Acceptance Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Earlette Jackson. This case was filed in Suffolk County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Suffolk, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Acceptance Corporation

Defendant

Earlette Jackson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUR, JOSEPH M

Attorney at RELIN GOLDSTEIN & CRANE LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/21/2018; Received: 04/11/2018

AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit

AFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS EARLETTE JACKSON

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS EARLETTE JACKSON; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/21/2018; Received: 04/11/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Non-Military Affidavit; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/20/2018; Received: 03/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOS EARLETTE JACKSON; Filed By: Shur, J. - filed by ACCU-SERVE PROCESS SERVICE LTD; Filed: 01/17/2018; Received: 01/17/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 09/21/2017; Received: 09/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less