Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Steuben County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 16:15:05 (UTC).

Credit Acceptance Corporation - v. - David J. Rice et al

Case Summary

On 06/18/2018 Credit Acceptance Corporation filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against David J Rice. This case was filed in Steuben County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********43CV

  • Filing Date:

    06/18/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Steuben County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Steuben, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Acceptance Corporation

Defendants

Trisha L Rice

David J Rice

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUR, JOSEPH M

Attorney at RELIN GOLDSTEIN & CRANE LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

AFFIRMATION

AFFIRMATION; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non Military Service

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non Military Service; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance

AFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 04/05/2019; Received: 04/05/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Non Military Service; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT Affidavit of Compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 03/26/2019; Received: 03/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/16/2018; Received: 07/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 06/18/2018; Received: 06/18/2018

    Read MoreRead Less