This case was last updated from Onondaga County Courts on 02/08/2020 at 20:02:33 (UTC).

Credit Acceptance Corporation - v. - Christopher M. Seamans et al

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 Credit Acceptance Corporation filed a Finance - Consumer Credit lawsuit against Christopher M Seamans. This case was filed in Onondaga County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ******1951

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Consumer Credit

  • Court:

    Onondaga County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Onondaga, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Credit Acceptance Corporation

Defendants

Christopher M. Seamans

Stacey Miller

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SHUR, JOSEPH M

Attorney at RELIN GOLDSTEIN & CRANE LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of nonmilitary

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of nonmilitary; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of nonmilitary

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of nonmilitary; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of compliance

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of compliance

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of nonmilitary

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of nonmilitary; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of nonmilitary

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of nonmilitary; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of compliance

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of compliance

AFFIDAVIT affidavit of compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract

EXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 08/01/2017; Received: 08/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of nonmilitary; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of nonmilitary; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of nonmilitary; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of nonmilitary; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT affidavit of compliance; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/28/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) *Corrected*; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 07/28/2017; Received: 07/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 06/06/2017; Received: 06/06/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Contract; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Shur, J.; Filed: 05/05/2017; Received: 05/05/2017

    Read MoreRead Less