This case was last updated from Nassau County Courts on 02/15/2020 at 13:08:51 (UTC).

Covington Specialty Insurance Company - v. - Daddy Locos, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 Covington Specialty Insurance Company filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Daddy Locos, Inc. This case was filed in Nassau County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2017

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    Nassau County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Nassau, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Covington Specialty Insurance Company

Defendants

666 Fulton Ave Corp. a/k/a 666 Fulton Avenue Corp.

Daddy Locos, Inc.

Aylin Billi

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

SCOTT, JOHN R.

Attorney at Hardin Kundla McKeon & Poletto.

HARDIN, GEORGE RICHARD

Attorney at Hardin Kundla McKeon & Poletto, P.A.

Defendant Attorney

COHN, STEVEN

Attorney at STEVEN COHN ESQ., PC

 

Court Documents

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

NOTICE OF ENTRY

--none--

DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION

Seq # 001, 002

EXHIBIT(S)

Ex. D to Affirmation

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

Ex. G to Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S)

Ex. F to Affirmation

EXHIBIT(S)

Covington policy

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT

of motion for summary judgment

NOTICE OF MOTION

for summary judgment

ANSWER

Verified Answer

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

--none--

EXHIBIT(S)

RSUI Commercial General Liability Policy

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

--none--

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #002); Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001); Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #001); Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 11/02/2017; Received: 11/02/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #002) Seq # 001, 002; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/31/2017; Received: 10/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #002) Ex. D to Affirmation; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #002); Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #002) Ex. G to Affirmation; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #002) Ex. F to Affirmation; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #002) Ex. E to Affirmation; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 08/09/2017; Received: 08/09/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
15 More Docket Entries
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Covington Reservation of Rights letter; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Covington policy; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) of motion for summary judgment; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) for summary judgment; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 08/03/2017; Received: 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER Verified Answer; Filed By: Cohn, S.; Filed: 07/17/2017; Received: 07/17/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 07/07/2017; Received: 07/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A RSUI Commercial General Liability Policy; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Scott, J.; Filed: 06/07/2017; Received: 06/07/2017

    Read MoreRead Less