This case was last updated from Madison County New York Courts on 01/24/2022 at 07:28:35 (UTC).

COUNTRYWAY INSURANCE COMPANY As Subrogee of ANGELO DEMAURO v. JOHN P PURCELL

Case Summary

On 07/07/2021 COUNTRYWAY INSURANCE COMPANY As Subrogee of ANGELO DEMAURO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against JOHN P PURCELL. This case was filed in Madison County New York Courts, Supreme Court located in Orange, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is Donald F Cerio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1598

  • Filing Date:

    07/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Madison, New York

Judge Details

Judge

Donald F Cerio

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COUNTRYWAY INSURANCE COMPANY As Subrogee of ANGELO DEMAURO

Defendant

John P Purcell

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PANTERIS, GEORGE

Defendant Attorney

GLICK, ROBERT ADAM

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Panteris, G.; Filed: 07/07/2021; Received: 07/07/2021

AFFIDAVIT

AFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Panteris, G. - filed by Devoe, J.; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Panteris, G. - filed by Devoe, J.; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Panteris, G.; Filed: 10/27/2021; Received: 10/27/2021

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/27/2021; Received: 10/27/2021

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A; Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B; Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C; Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D; Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT

OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2021; Received: 12/06/2021

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #1)

ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #1); Filed By: Panteris, G.; Filed: 01/04/2022; Received: 01/04/2022

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST (Motion #1); Filed By: Panteris, G.; Filed: 01/04/2022; Received: 01/04/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/06/2021; Received: 12/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) Exhibit D; Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) Exhibit C; Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Exhibit B; Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) Exhibit A; Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support; Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion; Filed By: Glick, R.; Filed: 12/01/2021; Received: 12/01/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/27/2021; Received: 10/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Panteris, G.; Filed: 10/27/2021; Received: 10/27/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Panteris, G. - filed by Devoe, J.; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Filed By: Panteris, G. - filed by Devoe, J.; Filed: 09/23/2021; Received: 09/23/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Panteris, G.; Filed: 07/07/2021; Received: 07/07/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less