This case was last updated from Tompkins County Courts on 02/16/2020 at 00:00:39 (UTC).

CORTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC. - v. - MICHAEL W WARNER

Case Summary

On 06/21/2017 CORTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against MICHAEL W WARNER. This case was filed in Tompkins County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0108

  • Filing Date:

    06/21/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Tompkins County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Tompkins, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORTLAND REGIONAL MEDICAL CENTER, INC.

Defendant

Michael W Warner

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SPINNER, MARK DAVID

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF BURR & REID

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF ADDITIONAL NOTICE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF ADDITIONAL NOTICE; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS INCLUDING DATES OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS INCLUDING DATES OF SERVICE; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF NONMILITARY SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF NONMILITARY SERVICE; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT AND REDACTION PAGE

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT AND REDACTION PAGE; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 06/11/2019; Received: 06/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 05/13/2019; Received: 05/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE OF ADDITIONAL NOTICE; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS INCLUDING DATES OF SERVICE; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NONMILITARY SERVICE; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 01/10/2018; Received: 01/10/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 07/24/2017; Received: 07/24/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT AND REDACTION PAGE; Filed By: Spinner, M.; Filed: 06/21/2017; Received: 06/21/2017

    Read MoreRead Less