This case was last updated from Chautauqua County Courts on 02/28/2020 at 21:45:04 (UTC).

Corry Concrete, Inc. v. Daniel D. Johnson

Case Summary

On 05/24/2019 Corry Concrete, Inc filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Daniel D Johnson. This case was filed in Chautauqua County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The Judge overseeing this case is James Dillon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0822

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    Chautauqua County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Chautauqua, New York

Judge Details

Judge

James Dillon

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORRY CONCRETE INC

Defendant

Daniel D Johnson

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

YOARS, PETER WIGHT

Attorney at YOARS LAW LLC

YOARS, PETER W

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF TODD J KROUNER

 

Court Documents

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT

SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service of Notice of Entry

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service of Notice of Entry; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

NOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment

NOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Amended

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Amended; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

BILL OF COSTS

BILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Aff of Service of Notice of Entry

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Aff of Service of Notice of Entry; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION

RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exemplification of Record

EXHIBIT(S) - E Exemplification of Record; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D Praecipe for Entry of Default

EXHIBIT(S) - D Praecipe for Entry of Default; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C Notice of Default

EXHIBIT(S) - C Notice of Default; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Service of Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Service of Complaint; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint in debt collection

EXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint in debt collection; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #1); Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI

SUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 01/07/2020; Received: 01/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service of Notice of Entry; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 07/23/2019; Received: 07/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY Judgment; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 07/12/2019; Received: 07/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 07/10/2019; Received: 07/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) Amended; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 07/09/2019; Received: 07/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketBILL OF COSTS; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Aff of Service of Notice of Entry; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) *Corrected*; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 06/27/2019; Received: 06/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/28/2019; Received: 05/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Exemplification of Record; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Praecipe for Entry of Default; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Notice of Default; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Affidavit of Service of Complaint; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Complaint in debt collection; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN LIEU OF COMPLAINT (Motion #1); Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS AND 3213 MOTION W/ RJI; Filed By: Yoars, P.; Filed: 05/24/2019; Received: 05/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less