This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 00:12:59 (UTC).

Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union v. TOSHEANA BRIGGS

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TOSHEANA BRIGGS. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Tosheana Briggs

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OVERBECK, MELISSA LYNN

Attorney at CHIARI & ILECKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1)

ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1)

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)

NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER extend time

RJI -RE: OTHER extend time; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE amended affidavit of service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE amended affidavit of service; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/16/2020; Received: 01/16/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER extend time; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 12/10/2019; Received: 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE amended affidavit of service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/12/2019; Received: 09/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/06/2019; Received: 09/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less