Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 16:03:44 (UTC).

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. TIA R. COOK

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TIA R COOK. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Tia R Cook

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OVERBECK, MELISSA LYNN

Attorney at CHIARI & ILECKI, LLP

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT

JUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/07/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 12/07/2019; Received: 12/07/2019

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1)

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 11/29/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) military status

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) amended affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) amended affidavit of service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE amended affidavit of service

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE amended affidavit of service; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/07/2019; Received: 12/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 12/07/2019; Received: 12/07/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 12/02/2019; Received: 11/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) amended affidavit of service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/29/2019; Received: 10/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE amended affidavit of service; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 04/30/2019; Received: 04/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 04/26/2019; Received: 04/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less