Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 02:40:52 (UTC).

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. REBECCA M. CRAFT

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against REBECCA M CRAFT. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Rebecca M Craft

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 01/18/2020; Received: 01/18/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 01/18/2020; Received: 01/18/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 02/01/2020; Received: 02/01/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 01/18/2020; Received: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 01/18/2020; Received: 01/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/09/2020; Received: 01/09/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less