Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/23/2020 at 16:02:17 (UTC).

Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union v. LAMONT M. CANDY JR.

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LAMONT M CANDY JR. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Lamont M Candy JR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OVERBECK, MELISSA LYNN

Attorney at CHIARI & ILECKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1) Signed

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1) Signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) military status

EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of facts

EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of facts; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1) Signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 02/14/2020; Received: 02/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) affidavit of facts; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 01/30/2020; Received: 01/30/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 07/31/2019; Received: 07/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 07/17/2019; Received: 07/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 03/06/2019; Received: 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less