Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/11/2020 at 14:56:18 (UTC).

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. KYLA KUBISZYN

Case Summary

On 08/21/2019 CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against KYLA KUBISZYN. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    08/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Kyla Kubiszyn

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OVERBECK, MELISSA LYNN

Attorney at CHIARI & ILECKI, LLP

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI)

STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Ilecki, W.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & llecki LLP; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & llecki LLP; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/26/2019; Received: 09/26/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (PRE RJI); Filed By: Ilecki, W.; Filed: 09/19/2019; Received: 09/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/17/2019; Received: 09/17/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & llecki LLP; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & llecki LLP; Filed: 08/21/2019; Received: 08/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less