Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 02/22/2020 at 21:58:26 (UTC).

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. JEREL DIAZ

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JEREL DIAZ. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Jerel Diaz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

OVERBECK, MELISSA LYNN

Attorney at CHIARI & ILECKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Verification

EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ostrowski, M.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Overbeck, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Military Verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ostrowski, M.; Filed: 10/18/2019; Received: 10/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE AOM; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 04/24/2019; Received: 04/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 04/18/2019; Received: 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP; Filed: 04/09/2019; Received: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 02/21/2019; Received: 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less