This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 19:47:30 (UTC).

Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union - v. - JASON DORSANEO

Case Summary

On 06/20/2018 Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JASON DORSANEO. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Jason Dorsaneo

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W.; Filed: 09/23/2018; Received: 09/23/2018

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1) signed

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1) signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military status

EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service

EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision

EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation

AFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom-308

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom-308; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/23/2018; Received: 07/23/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/23/2018; Received: 07/23/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/20/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/20/2018

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/23/2018; Received: 09/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W.; Filed: 09/23/2018; Received: 09/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1) signed; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 09/20/2018; Received: 09/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) military status; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) affidavit of service; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) summons and complaint; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) attorney fee provision; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION (Motion #1) attorney's affirmation; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom-308; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/02/2018; Received: 08/02/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/23/2018; Received: 07/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 07/23/2018; Received: 07/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less