This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 03/12/2020 at 01:32:03 (UTC).

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION v. HEATHER HURLEY

Case Summary

On 09/03/2019 CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against HEATHER HURLEY. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2019

  • Filing Date:

    09/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Niagara County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORNERSTONE COMMUNITY FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

Defendant

Heather Hurley

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - F Affidavit of Mailing

EXHIBIT(S) - F Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Facts

EXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Facts; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - D Military Verification

EXHIBIT(S) - D Military Verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service

EXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint

EXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

EXHIBIT(S) - A Attorney Fee Provision

EXHIBIT(S) - A Attorney Fee Provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

AFFIRMATION Attorney's Affirmation

AFFIRMATION Attorney's Affirmation; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - F Affidavit of Mailing; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - E Affidavit of Facts; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - D Military Verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - C Affidavit of Service; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - B Summons and Complaint; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Attorney Fee Provision; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION Attorney's Affirmation; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/11/2020; Received: 03/11/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aom 3215; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 11/12/2019; Received: 11/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/01/2019; Received: 11/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE aos; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 10/22/2019; Received: 10/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 09/03/2019; Received: 09/03/2019

    Read MoreRead Less