This case was last updated from Niagara County Courts on 05/02/2020 at 19:53:01 (UTC).

Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union - v. - DORILY GARCIA

Case Summary

On 06/20/2018 Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DORILY GARCIA. This case was filed in Niagara County Courts, Supreme Court located in Washington, New York. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2018

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Niagara, New York

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cornerstone Community Federal Credit Union

Defendant

Dorily Garcia

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ILECKI, WILLIAM

Attorney at ILECKI & OSTROWSKI, LLP

OSTROWSKI, MELISSA

Attorney at Ilecki & Ostrowski, LLP

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp

JUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Verification

EXHIBIT(S) - A Military Verification; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED)

JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1)

ORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1)

RJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1)

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #1) military verification

EXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #1) military verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)

EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/12/2018; Received: 11/12/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS

AFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE

AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING

STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/20/2018

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT

SUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/20/2018

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT Clerk stamp; Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/11/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - A Military Verification; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED); Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki LLP; Filed: 03/08/2019; Received: 03/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER - EXPARTE (Motion #1); Filed By: Court User; Filed: 03/04/2019; Received: 03/01/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRJI -RE: OTHER EX PARTE APPLICATION (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - b (Motion #1) military verification; Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXHIBIT(S) - a (Motion #1) attorney fee provision Redacted per 22 NYCRR 202.5(e); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION OF ATTORNEY FEES (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED) (Motion #1); Filed By: Ostrowski, M. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 01/31/2019; Received: 01/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 11/12/2018; Received: 11/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE affidavit of mailing; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 09/07/2018; Received: 09/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF FACTS; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 08/21/2018; Received: 08/21/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Chiari & Ilecki, LLP; Filed: 08/07/2018; Received: 08/07/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS + COMPLAINT; Filed By: Ilecki, W. - filed by Ferraro, A.; Filed: 06/20/2018; Received: 06/20/2018

    Read MoreRead Less